CA ACA14 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-3)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 9.5 to Article IX thereof, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: support services: equal employment opportunity standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk Reconsider (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk Reconsider (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Senate - Sen Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - ACA 14 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk Reconsider (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA14 Gonzalez et al. By Wilk (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Result (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Senate - Sen Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-20 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - ACA 14 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2960.) |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2959.) |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 2401.) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Measure version as revised on June 19 corrected. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 19). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee May 5. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |