CA ACR105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Legislature.
Title
Legislature: Wounded Warrior Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR105 Nestande (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - ACR 105 NESTANDE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - ACR 105 NESTANDE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4954.) |
2014-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6594.) |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 25). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |