CA ACR114 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-21)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a Day of Remembrance.
Title
Day of Remembrance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | From Senate committee without further action. | |
2010-03-01 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-25 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4172.) | |
2010-02-18 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 18). | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2010-02-04 | From printer. | |
2010-02-03 | Introduced. To print. |