CA ACR115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to gun-related businesses.
Title
Lending to gun-related businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 115 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 115 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (January 15). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 2839.) |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 12). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |