CA ACR136 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-16)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-16)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Black History Month.
Title
Black History Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Special Consent ACR136 Holden et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-03-21 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4189.) |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 20). |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |