CA ACR161 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Compost Awareness Week.
Title
Compost Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |