CA ACR173 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-14)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to APOL1-Mediated Kidney Disease (AMKD) Awareness Day.
Title
APOL1-Mediated Kidney Disease (AMKD) Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Assembly - ACR 173 Bains Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |