CA ACR174 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Tourism Month.
Title
California Tourism Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR174 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-17 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4132.) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4747.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |