CA ACR34 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Maria Cecilia Rosa Memorial Highway.
Title
The Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Maria Cecilia Rosa
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Assembly - ACR 34 FURUTANI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #7 ACR34 Furutani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - ACR 34 FURUTANI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent #7 ACR34 Furutani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - ACR 34 FURUTANI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-06-09 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |
2009-06-03 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2049.) | |
2009-06-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-06-02 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1149.) | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 12). | |
2009-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-04-13 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-13 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 824.) | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 1). | |
2009-03-24 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |