CA ACR4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the CHP Officer Kirk Griess Memorial Highway.
Title
CHP Officer Kirk Griess Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-01 - Senate - Special Consent ACR4 Frazier et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - ACR 4 Frazier Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - ACR 4 Frazier Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1875.) |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 706.) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 11). |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |