CA ACR43 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-25-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-25-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Aerospace Week.
Title
California Aerospace Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR43 O'Donnell By Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 634.) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 653.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |