CA ACR52 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-29)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-29)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to high technology.
Title
High technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR52 Solorio DeSaulnier (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-06-25 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2009-06-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-22 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1374.) | |
2009-05-21 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-05-13 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-11 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1362.) (Corrected May 12.) | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. | |
2009-03-17 | Introduced. To print. |