CA ACR61 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Nurses Week.
Title
California Nurses Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR61 Hayashi By Lieu (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - ACR 61 HAYASHI Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - ACR 61 HAYASHI Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-25 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |
2012-06-18 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-06-18 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3957.) | |
2012-05-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-01 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2011-07-01 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2011-06-22 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-18 | From printer. | |
2011-05-17 | Introduced. To print. |