CA ACR96 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-22)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-22)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 150th anniversary of the California State Park System.
Title
The 150th anniversary of the California State Park
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR96 Olsen By Padilla (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4608.) |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 30 corrected. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5739.) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Amended. (Page 5492.) |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |