CA AJR32 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Nagorno-Karabakh Republic.
Title
The Nagorno-Karabakh Republic.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR32 Gatto By De Le (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AJR 32 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AJR 32 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 0. Page 4921.) |
2014-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 4845.) |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 5). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |