CA AR29 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 4332.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 4332.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to outsourcing public services.
Title
Relative to outsourcing public services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Assembly - HR 29 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 4332.) |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 2). |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced. |