CA AR42 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-13)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2538.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-13)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2538.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 4th of July.
Title
Relative to the 4th of July.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2538.). |
2023-07-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Introduced. |