CA AR45 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2591.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2591.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to probation.
Title
Relative to probation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-10 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2591.). |
2023-07-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | Introduced. |