CA AR5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-22)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 237.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 237.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Commemoration of Rosa Parks' 100th birthday.
Title
Relative to the Commemoration of Rosa Parks' 100th birthday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 237.). |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 31). |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced. |