CA AR53 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2373.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2373.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the California State University Class of 4 Million.
Title
Relative to the California State University Class of 4 Million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - HR 53 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2373.). |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced. |