CA SB1012 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 101 and 729 of, to add Chapter 7.1 (commencing with Section 3200) to Division 2 of, and to add Division 11 (commencing with Section 27000) to, the Business and Professions Code, to add Section 1550.6 to the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 11350, 11351, 11352, 11364.7, 11377, 11378, 11379, 11390, and 11391 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
The Regulated Psychedelic Facilitators Act and the Regulated Psychedelic-Assisted Therapy Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 3605.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in PUB S. pending receipt. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and PUB S. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 729 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1550.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11364.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11378 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11379 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11390 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11391 | Amended Code | Citation Text |