CA SB1023 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 79220) to Chapter 9 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: foster youth.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1023 Liu Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1023 Liu Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1023 Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1023 Liu Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1023 Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4643.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6163.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5641.) |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3696.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3707.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3213.) (April 22). |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2976.) (March 26). |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 79156 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 79220 | New Code | See Bill Text |