CA SB1031 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65081 and 66516 of, to add Section 13978.9 to, to add the heading of Division 1 (commencing with Section 66500) to Title 7.1 of, and to add Division 2 (commencing with Section 66538) to Title 7.1 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 99270.5 of the Public Utilities Code, to add Section 976.9 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to add Section 9250.3 to the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Francisco Bay area: local revenue measure: transportation improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in REV. & TAX. pending receipt. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13978.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66516 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 976.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 99270.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |