CA SB1034 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 195, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 195, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1357.51, 1357.514, 1357.600, and 1357.614 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1357.506 and 1357.607 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10198.7, 10753.05, 10755, and 10755.05 of, and to repeal and add Sections 10753.08 and 10755.08 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: waiting periods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1034 Monning Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Assembly - SB 1034 Monning Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1034 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Assembly - SB 1034 Monning Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1034 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 195, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4295.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5745.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5704.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3162.) (April 9). |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1357.506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.607 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10198.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10755 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10755.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10755.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |