CA SB1038 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11108.3, 25250, and 26835 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 26905 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 28495) to Chapter 6 of Division 6 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3530.) (April 9). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3351.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11108.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26905 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |