CA SB1054 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Set for hearing April 22.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Set for hearing April 22.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.65 (commencing with Section 25760) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 748.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Climate Pollution Reduction in Homes Initiative: natural gas: customer credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25760 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 748.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |