CA SB1063 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2105.7 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voter registration: juvenile detention facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1063 Block Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1063 Block Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1063 Block Senate Third Reading By WEBER Amend By WEBER Set #1 (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1063 Block (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1063 Block Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1063 Block Senate Third Reading By WEBER Amend By WEBER Set #1 (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1063 Block (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6126.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6023.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6). |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3599.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3708.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3233.) (April 22). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2105.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2105.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |