CA SB1063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56345.1 and 56462 of, to amend and renumber Section 56021.1 of, and to add Section 56021.1 to, the Education Code, and to amend Sections 4868, 4869, 19000, 19095, 19098, 19098.5, 19103, 19104, 19150, and 19152 of, and to add Section 19155 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services: competitive integrated employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56021.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 56345.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56462 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19098 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19098.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 19155 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4868 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4869 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1063 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1063 |