CA SB1100 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6354.8 to, and to repeal and amend Section 6354.7 of, the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Worker occupational safety and health training and education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Monning. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4003.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3645.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3421.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and HEALTH. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6354.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6354.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |