CA SB1106 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1159.1 to the Labor Code, relating to agricultural labor relations.
Title
Agricultural labor relations: certified labor organizations: reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in L. & I.R. pending receipt. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 9454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1159.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |