CA SB1107 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10814 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services: county departments: mail programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3427.) (April 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and G.O. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10814 | New Code | See Bill Text |