CA SB1112 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14093.11 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: families with subsidized childcare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3606.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3380.) (March 20). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14093.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |