CA SB1122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38561.7 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 400.3 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Green electrolytic hydrogen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and APPR. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38561.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 400.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1122 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1122 |