CA SB1125 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 19843.5 and 19943.5 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Gambling Control Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Florez [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1125 Florez (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1125 Florez Senate Third Reading By HALL (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1125 Florez (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1125 Florez Senate Third Reading By HALL (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1125 Florez (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4911.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 6515.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) | |
2010-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2010-06-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 3722.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-27 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3427.) | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3180.) | |
2010-03-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-16 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |