CA SB1154 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Set for hearing April 23.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Set for hearing April 23.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 17370) to Part 2 of Division 7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business regulations.
Title
California Preventing Algorithmic Collusion Act of 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17370 | New Code | See Bill Text |