CA SB1157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4032 to the Penal Code, relating to incarcerated persons.
Title
Incarcerated persons: visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1157 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1157 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1157 Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1157 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1157 Mitchell (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-27 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-27 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 6226.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 4104.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4004.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3522.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 210.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 885 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 885.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |