CA SB1159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 77.8 to, and to add and repeal Sections 3212.86, 3212.87, and 3212.88 of, the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation: COVID-19: critical workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1159 Hill Third Reading Urgency By Daly (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1159 Hill et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1159 Hill et al (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 4.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended.
2020-08-30AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14.)
2020-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 11).
2020-08-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2020-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3769.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
2020-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code3212.86Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3212.87Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3212.88Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code77.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback