CA SB1176 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4114.1 to the Public Resources Code, relating to wildfires.
Title
Wildfires: workgroup: toxic heavy metals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3532.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4114.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |