CA SB1178 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 13 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 13 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 28 (commencing with Section 16150) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
California Water Quality and Public Health Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 16150 | New Code | See Bill Text |