CA SB1183 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 78261.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: registered nursing programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1183 Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3466.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78261.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |