CA SB119 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8344.5 of, and to add Section 8344.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to crematories.
Title
Crematories: burning of flags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - SB 119 Calderon Senate Third Reading By GOMEZ (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB119 Calderon (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB119 Calderon (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 809.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 563.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 8344.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 8344.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |