CA SB119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19829.9848, 19829.9849, 19829.9850, 20677.5, 20683.71, 20683.9, 20683.91, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 19829.9851, 19829.9852, 20677.5.1, and 20683.81.3 to, the Government Code, relating to state employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employment: State Bargaining Units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 119 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB119 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB119 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2020.
2020-08-06 Approved by the Governor.
2020-08-04SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 8.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-03AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-08-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 12.)
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-03-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 677.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback