CA SB1195 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 109, 116, 153, 307, 313.1, 2708, 4800, 4804.5, 4830, 4846.5, 4904, and 4905 of, and to add Sections 109.5, 4826.5, 4848.1, and 4853.7 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 825 and 11346.5 of the Government Code, relating to professional regulations.
Title
Professions and vocations: board actions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3592.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |