CA SB1203 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 693, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 693, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 214 of, and to add Sections 214.06 and 214.08 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: welfare exemption: rental housing and related facilities: payment in lieu of taxes agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1203 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1203 Jackson Senate Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1203 Jackson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1203 Jackson Senate Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1203 Jackson (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 693, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4879.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6402.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3257.) (April 24). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66009 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |