CA SB1210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 8400) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to utility service.
Title
New housing construction: electrical, gas, sewer, and water service: service connection information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 1. Page 3445.) (April 2). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17 in L. GOV. pending receipt. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L. GOV. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8400 | New Code | See Bill Text |