CA SB1219 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42254 and 42257 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: plastic bags.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1219 Wolk Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1219 Wolk (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1219 Wolk (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 6074.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3400.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3189.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 16. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42254 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |