CA SB1223 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.99.90, 1798.130, 1798.140, and 1798.185 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Consumer privacy: sensitive personal information: neural data.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |