CA SB1229 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3.)
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3.)
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 12130) of Part 4 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Insurance disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3.) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12130 | New Code | See Bill Text |