CA SB1252 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11403.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services: former foster youth: transitional housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1252 Torres Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1252 Torres Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1252 Torres (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1252 Torres Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1252 Torres (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4945.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6538.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3698.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3214.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |