CA SB1263 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44259, 44283, and 44468 of, and to repeal Sections 44320.2 and 44320.3 of, the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: teaching performance assessments: repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3659.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44320.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44320.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44468 | Amended Code | Citation Text |